Terms of Service
-
House,
71st
(1)
(2)
Legislature
3/28/1989 - 1/8/1991
Republican
(1)
Ken VanderVoort, in special election 3/21/1989, sworn 3/28/1989, succeeded David M. Patronella, resigned 2/2/1989.
Members of the Texas Congress 1836-1845; Members of the Texas Legislature 1846-2004 2005.
(2)
Special election 3/7/1989, runoff 3/21/1989.
Texas Secretary of State - Election Dates Including Special Elections, 1966-2001 .