Terms of Service
-
House,
62nd
(2)
Legislature
1/12/1971 - 7/31/1972
Democrat
-
House,
61st Legislature
1/14/1969 - 1/12/1971
Democrat
-
House,
60th
(1)
(3)
Legislature
5/27/1968 - 1/14/1969
Democrat
(1)
Joseph A. Garcia, in special election 5/14/1968, sworn 5/27/1968, succeeded William M. Rapp, resigned 2/13/1968.
Members of the Texas Congress 1836-1845; Members of the Texas Legislature 1846-2004 2005.
(2)
Martin E. Garcia, in special election 9/16/1972, sworn 9/20/1972, succeeded Joseph A. Garcia, Jr., resigned 7/31/1972. Served 62nd 4th Called Session only.
Members of the Texas Congress 1836-1845; Members of the Texas Legislature 1846-2004 2005.
(3)
Sworn 5/27/1968.
Oaths of Office .