Legislative Reference Library
Texas Legislators: Past & Present
Robert J. 'Bob' Glasgow
Full Name: Robert Joe "Bob" Glasgow
Birth date: February 28, 1942
Death date: September 22, 2023
Terms of Service
Senate, 72nd & 71st Legislatures
1/10/1989 - 1/12/1993
Democrat
Senate President Pro Tempore, Regular Session, elected 1/8/1991.
Senate, 70th & 69th Legislatures
1/8/1985 - 1/10/1989
Democrat
Senate, 68th
(1)
Legislature
1/11/1983 - 1/8/1985
Democrat
Senate, 67th
(2)
Legislature
1/13/1981 - 1/11/1983
Democrat
(1) 68th Legislature - Drawing for Terms of Office, 3/17/1983, p. 495. Drew 2-year term (also see message from President, p. 467).
Senate Journal
.
(2) 2-year term; entire Senate went up for reelection in 1982 due to redistricting.
Texas Constitution Art. III, ยง3, Election and term of office of Senators
.
Biographical Notes and Resources
Selected Newspaper articles
Resolutions and Journal entries
72nd Legislature, R.S., HR 803.
Resolutions - Congratulatory and Honorary
.
71st Legislature, R.S., SR 184.
Resolutions - Congratulatory and Honorary
.
71st Legislature, 3rd C.S., SR 8.
Resolutions - Congratulatory and Honorary
.
67th Legislature, R.S., SR 299.
Resolutions - Congratulatory and Honorary
.
72nd Legislature, 4th C.S., SR 15.
Resolutions - Congratulatory and Honorary
.
70th Legislature, R.S., SR 129.
Resolutions - Congratulatory and Honorary
.
68th Legislature, R.S., SR 215.
Resolutions - Congratulatory and Honorary
.
Texas Monthly's
Best and Worst Legislators
Named 'Worst Hypocrite'.
Best and Worst Legislators
1991.
Named one of 'The Worst'.
Best and Worst Legislators
1989.
Named one of 'The Best'.
Best and Worst Legislators
1987.
Photographs
Photograph.
Bob Glasgow,
State Preservation Board
Photograph.
Bob Glasgow,
State Preservation Board
Photograph.
Bob Glasgow,
State Preservation Board
Photograph.
Bob Glasgow,
State Preservation Board
Photograph.
Bob Glasgow,
State Preservation Board
Photograph.
Bob Glasgow,
State Preservation Board
Other Resources
Biographical sketch and photo.
Texas Senate, 67th Legislature
1981.
Biographical sketch and photo.
Texas Senate, 68th Legislature
1983.
Biographical sketch and photo.
Texas Senate, 69th Legislature
1985.
Biographical sketch and photo.
Texas Senate, 70th Legislature
1987.
Biographical sketch and photo.
Texas Senate, 71st Legislature
1989.
Biographical sketch and photo.
Texas Senate, 72nd Legislature
1991.
United States Army.
Texas Senate, 72nd Legislature
1991.
Notice of death, 9/25/2023. Death date 9/22/2023.
Texas Senate, Secretary of the Senate
.
Glasgow, Robert Joe.
Texas State Cemetery
.
United States Army. Photo and salute.
With Honor and Gratitude: A Special Thank You to Our Texas Senate Members Who Served Our Country
2017.
Committee Information
72nd R.S. - 1991
Administration, Special
Committee of the Whole on Redistricting, Special
Committee of the Whole on Redistricting, Special, Subcommittee on Legislative Districts
(Chair)
Education
Environment, Interim
Government Efficiency, Interim
Jurisprudence
(Vice Chair)
Jurisprudence, Interim
(Vice Chair)
Nominations, Special
State Affairs
(Chair)
State Affairs Subcommittee on Elections and Ethics
(Vice Chair)
State Affairs, Interim
(Chair)
State Affairs, Interim Subcommitee on Workforce Development
71st R.S. - 1989
Administration, Special
Committee of the Whole Senate
Finance
(Vice Chair)
Judicial Selection
Jurisprudence
(Chair)
Legislative Redistricting, Select
(Chair)
Public Education, Select
State Affairs
Workers' Compensation Insurance Policies, Special
70th R.S. - 1987
Administration, Special
Committee of the Whole Senate
Criminal Justice
Economic Development
(Vice Chair)
Finance
(Vice Chair)
Rules, Special
(Chair)
Tax Equity, Select
Workers Compensation, Select
(Co-Chair)
69th R.S. - 1985
Committee of the Whole Senate
Criminal Justice
Economic Development
(Vice Chair)
Finance
Premium Tax Task Force
Texas State Artist
68th R.S. - 1983
Committee of the Whole Senate
Committee of the Whole Senate, Subcommittee on Finance
Economic Development
(Vice Chair)
Finance
Judiciary, Select
Jurisprudence
Jurisprudence Subcommittee on Criminal Matters
(Chair)
67th R.S. - 1981
Economic Development
Human Resources
Human Resources Subcommittee on Public Health and Welfare
Jurisprudence
Jurisprudence Subcommittee on Criminal Matters
(Vice Chair)
Rules of Evidence, Interim
LRL Home
|
View full site