Legislative Reference Library
Texas Legislators: Past & Present
Dean Neugent
Full Name: L. Dean Neugent
Birth date: May 28, 1916
Death date: April 1, 2003
Terms of Service
House, 62nd Legislature
1/12/1971 - 1/9/1973
Democrat
House, 61st Legislature
1/14/1969 - 1/12/1971
Democrat
House, 60th Legislature
1/10/1967 - 1/14/1969
Democrat
House, 59th
(1)
Legislature
1/12/1965 - 1/10/1967
Democrat
(1) Sworn 11/23/1964.
Oaths of Office
.
Biographical Notes and Resources
Selected Newspaper articles
Resolutions and Journal entries
60th Legislature, R.S., HSR 432.
Resolutions - Congratulatory and Honorary
.
60th Legislature, R.S., HSR 433.
Resolutions - Congratulatory and Honorary
.
61st Legislature, R.S., HSR 493.
Resolutions - Congratulatory and Honorary
.
62nd Legislature, R.S., HSR 613.
Resolutions - Congratulatory and Honorary
.
62nd Legislature, R.S., HSR 614.
Resolutions - Congratulatory and Honorary
.
78th Legislature, R.S., SCR 58.
Resolutions - Memorial
.
Photographs
Photograph.
Dean Neugent,
State Preservation Board
Photograph.
Dean Neugent,
State Preservation Board
Photograph.
Dean Neugent,
State Preservation Board
Committee Information
62nd R.S. - 1971
Banks and Banking
Congressional and Legislative Districts
House Administration
Liquor Regulation
Public Health
(Chair)
61st R.S. - 1969
Common Carriers
Land Use and Environmental Control
Liquor Regulation
Private Vocational-Technical Education
Public Health
(Chair)
Revenue and Taxation
Rules
60th R.S. - 1967
Banks and Banking
Congressional and Legislative Districts
Examination of Comptroller's and Treasurer's Accounts
Insurance
Land Use and Environmental Control
Liquor Regulation
(Vice Chair)
59th R.S. - 1965
Banks and Banking
Common Carriers
Congressional and Legislative Districts
Liquor Regulation
Multiple Use and Pollution of All Waters of Texas (Cont. of Bays of Texas, 58th)
Oil, Gas and Mining
LRL Home
|
View full site