Legislative Reference Library
Texas Legislators: Past & Present
Ace Pickens
Full Name: Franklin Ace Pickens
Terms of Service
House, 62nd Legislature
1/12/1971 - 1/9/1973
Democrat
House, 61st Legislature
1/14/1969 - 1/12/1971
Democrat
House, 60th Legislature
1/10/1967 - 1/14/1969
Democrat
House, 59th
(1)
Legislature
1/12/1965 - 1/10/1967
Democrat
(1) Sworn 11/23/1964.
Oaths of Office
.
Biographical Notes and Resources
Resolutions and Journal entries
60th Legislature, R.S., HSR 182.
Resolutions - Congratulatory and Honorary
.
60th Legislature, R.S., HSR 337.
Resolutions - Congratulatory and Honorary
.
61st Legislature, 1st C.S., HSR 53.
Resolutions - Congratulatory and Honorary
.
Photographs
Photograph.
Ace Pickens,
State Preservation Board
Photograph.
Ace Pickens,
State Preservation Board
Photograph.
Ace Pickens,
State Preservation Board
Photograph.
Ace Pickens,
State Preservation Board
Other Resources
Pickens, Ace.
Texas State Cemetery
.
Committee Information
62nd R.S. - 1971
Higher Education
Insurance
(Chair)
Judiciary
Motor Transportation
State Affairs
61st R.S. - 1969
Governmental Affairs and Efficiency
Higher Education
Insurance
Mass Transportation
Motor Transportation
(Vice Chair)
Public Health
60th R.S. - 1967
Banks and Banking
Commerce and Manufacturers
(Vice Chair)
Motor Traffic
Oil, Gas and Mining
State Affairs
59th R.S. - 1965
Appropriations
Engrossed Bills
Motor Traffic
Oil, Gas and Mining
Priority of State Tax Liens
Privileges, Suffrage and Elections
Visit Certain Military Installations, Special
LRL Home
|
View full site