Legislative Reference Library
Texas Legislators: Past & Present
Robert 'Bob' Salter
Full Name: Robert F. "Bob" Salter
Birth date: May 17, 1934
Death date: November 14, 2022
Terms of Service
House, 62nd
(1)
Legislature
1/12/1971 - 1/9/1973
Democrat
House, 61st Legislature
1/14/1969 - 1/12/1971
Democrat
House, 60th Legislature
1/10/1967 - 1/14/1969
Democrat
(1) Sworn 1/12/1971.
Oaths of Office
.
Biographical Notes and Resources
Selected Newspaper articles
Resolutions and Journal entries
61st Legislature, R.S., HSR 422.
Resolutions - Congratulatory and Honorary
.
Photographs
Photograph.
Bob Salter,
State Preservation Board
Photograph.
Bob Salter,
State Preservation Board
Photograph.
Bob Salter,
State Preservation Board
Other Resources
Obituary, "Robert.F. (Bob) Salter, Sr." 11/18/2022.
Waco Tribune-Herald
.
Committee Information
62nd R.S. - 1971
Appropriations
Congressional and Legislative Districts
Insurance
(Vice Chair)
Judiciary
Juvenile Crime and Deliquency
Life Insurance Companies, Prevention of Insolvencies
Parking Liaison
61st R.S. - 1969
Appropriations
Congressional and Legislative Districts
Election Code
Elections
(Vice Chair)
Foundations
Judiciary
Juvenile Crime and Deliquency
Parking and Traffic
60th R.S. - 1967
Common Carriers
Judicial Districts
Juvenile Crime and Delinquency
Mental Health and Mental Retardation
Revenue and Taxation
LRL Home
|
View full site