Terms of Service
-
House,
62nd Legislature
1/12/1971 - 1/9/1973
Democrat
-
House,
61st Legislature
1/14/1969 - 1/12/1971
Democrat
-
House,
60th Legislature
1/10/1967 - 1/14/1969
Democrat
-
House,
59th Legislature
1/12/1965 - 1/10/1967
Democrat
-
House,
58th
(3)
Legislature
1/8/1963 - 1/12/1965
Democrat
-
House,
57th Legislature
1/10/1961 - 1/8/1963
Democrat
-
House,
56th
(1)
(2)
(4)
Legislature
2/12/1960 - 1/10/1961
Democrat
(1)
James E. Ward, in special election 1/9/1960, succeeded Ted W. Myatt, resigned 10/17/1959. First session was 57th Regular Session.
Members of the Texas Congress 1836-1845; Members of the Texas Legislature 1846-2004 2005.
(2)
Sworn 2/12/1960; news article "House Member from Glen Rose Sworn in Friday."
Oaths of Office .
(3)
Sworn 11/23/1962.
Oaths of Office .
(4)
62nd Legislature - Ward oath of office 1/9/1960.
Texas House of Representatives, Chief Clerk's Office - Seniority Order .