Legislative Reference Library
Texas Legislators: Past & Present
Ralph Wayne
Full Name: Ralph Erskine Wayne
Terms of Service
House, 62nd Legislature
1/12/1971 - 1/9/1973
Democrat
House, 61st Legislature
1/14/1969 - 1/12/1971
Democrat
House, 60th Legislature
1/10/1967 - 1/14/1969
Democrat
House, 59th
(1)
Legislature
1/12/1965 - 1/10/1967
Democrat
(1) Sworn 11/23/1964.
Oaths of Office
.
Biographical Notes and Resources
Photographs
Photograph.
Ralph Wayne,
State Preservation Board
Photograph.
Ralph Wayne, Sr.,
State Preservation Board
Photograph.
Ralph Wayne,
State Preservation Board
Photograph.
Ralph Wayne,
State Preservation Board
Other Resources
Wayne, Ralph E.
Texas State Cemetery
.
Texas National Guard, United States Army.
Texas State Cemetery
.
Committee Information
62nd R.S. - 1971
Banks and Banking
Common Carriers
Interstate Cooperation
(Chair)
Parks and Wildlife
Urban Affairs
61st R.S. - 1969
Common Carriers
Facility for the Criminally Insane
Federal Relations
(Chair)
Labor
Public Health
Urban Affairs
60th R.S. - 1967
Banks and Banking
House Administration
(Chair)
Labor
Rules
State Affairs
Wages and Employment
59th R.S. - 1965
Aeronautics
Conservation and Reclamation
Penitentiaries
Rules
State Hospitals and Special Schools
Visit Certain Military Installations, Special
LRL Home
|
View full site