Terms of Service
-
House,
60th
(4)
Legislature
1/10/1967 - 1/14/1969
Republican
-
House,
58th
(1)
(2)
(3)
Legislature
4/25/1963 - 1/12/1965
Republican
(1)
Charles R. Scoggins, in special election 4/20/1963, sworn 4/25/1963, succeeded James L. Lattimore, died 3/7/1963.
Members of the Texas Congress 1836-1845; Members of the Texas Legislature 1846-2004 2005.
(2)
Sworn 4/25/1963.
Oaths of Office .
(3)
Republican. 1964-1965 edition, pp. 532-533.
Texas Almanac and State Industrial Guide .
(4)
Republican.
Texas House of Representatives, Chief Clerk's Office - Mailing Addresses, House of Representatives, 56th, 59th-61st Legislatures 1958.