Legislative Reference Library
Texas Legislators: Past & Present
Willis Whatley
Full Name: Willis James Whatley
Birth date: January 12, 1928
Death date: February 9, 1989
Terms of Service
House, 60th Legislature
1/10/1967 - 1/14/1969
Democrat
House, 59th Legislature
1/12/1965 - 1/10/1967
Democrat
House, 58th
(1)
Legislature
1/8/1963 - 1/12/1965
Democrat
(1) Sworn 11/23/1962.
Oaths of Office
.
Biographical Notes and Resources
Selected Newspaper articles
Resolutions and Journal entries
60th Legislature, R.S., HSR 19.
Resolutions - Congratulatory and Honorary
.
71st Legislature, R.S., HR 166.
Resolutions - Memorial
.
Photographs
Photograph.
Willis J. Whatley,
State Preservation Board
Photograph.
Willis Whatley,
State Preservation Board
Photograph.
Willis Whatley,
State Preservation Board
Other Resources
Memorial, April 1990, p. 419.
Texas Bar Journal
.
Committee Information
60th R.S. - 1967
Banks and Banking
Commerce and Manufacturers
Common Carriers
Facilities for the Criminally Insane and the Insane Criminal
(Chair)
Local Bills
(Chair)
Public Lands and Buildings
59th R.S. - 1965
Appropriations
Common Carriers
Housing and Physical Care for Criminally Insane Persons
(Chair)
Houston Legal Aid Foundation
Local and Uncontested Bills
(Chair)
Municipal and Private Corporations
Penitentiaries
58th R.S. - 1963
Criminal Jurisprudence
Highways and Roads
Insurance
Labor
Local and Uncontested Bills
LRL Home
|
View full site