Terms of Service
-
House,
68th
(1)
(2)
Legislature
3/20/1984 - 1/8/1985
Democrat
(1)
Neeley C. Lewis, in special election 3/10/1984, sworn 3/20/1984, succeeded Billy C. Presnal, resigned 1/14/1984. Served 68th 2nd Called Session only.
Members of the Texas Congress 1836-1845; Members of the Texas Legislature 1846-2004 2005.
(2)
Sworn 3/20/1984.
Oaths of Office .